Global Fx Partners Pty Ltd is a limited by shares, Australian proprietary company. This corporation was registered on 2011-01-19 and was issued with the 148866371 ACN. Its Australian Business Number is 66148866371. Since 2016-07-11, the company is headquartered in NSW, post code 2000. The previous headquarters were located in NSW 2050 (from 2014-09-25 to 2016-07-11), NSW 2050 (from 2014-04-03 to 2014-09-25), and NSW 2050 (from 2014-01-08 to 2014-04-03). Global Fx Partners Pty Ltd was registered for the GST on 2013-07-01, up until 2020-11-06. Global Fx Partners Pty Ltd has been using the Liao & Perera Investments Pty Limited trading name since 2011-01-19 (it has to be noted that the Australian Business Register no longer collects or updates trading names). In total the company used 1 trading name. The above data comes from the ABN database which was updated on 2020-11-07.
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Cancelled | Fri, 6th Nov 2020 | current |
Active | Wed, 19th Jan 2011 | Fri, 6th Nov 2020 |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Global Fx Partners Pty. Ltd. | Thu, 23rd May 2013 | current |
Liao & Perera Investments Pty Limited | Wed, 19th Jan 2011 | Thu, 23rd May 2013 |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Liao & Perera Investments Pty Limited | Wed, 19th Jan 2011 | current |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
NSW 2000 | Mon, 11th Jul 2016 | current |
NSW 2050 | Thu, 25th Sep 2014 | Mon, 11th Jul 2016 |
NSW 2050 | Thu, 3rd Apr 2014 | Thu, 25th Sep 2014 |
NSW 2050 | Wed, 8th Jan 2014 | Thu, 3rd Apr 2014 |
QLD 4217 | Wed, 19th Jan 2011 | Wed, 8th Jan 2014 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | Mon, 1st Jul 2013 | Fri, 6th Nov 2020 |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000402031 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | Thu, 14th Nov 2013 |
AFS authorised representative end date | Tue, 1st Sep 2015 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Sydney Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000402031 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | Mon, 27th May 2013 |
AFS authorised representative end date | Thu, 14th Nov 2013 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Sydney Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000402031 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | Thu, 10th Mar 2011 |
AFS authorised representative end date | Mon, 11th Apr 2011 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Surfers Paradise Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | No |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.