Bundow Pty Ltd is a limited by shares, Australian proprietary company. This corporation was registered on 1996-04-26 and was issued with the 073772291 ACN. Its Australian Business Number is 31073772291. Since 2016-01-08, the company is headquartered in QLD, post code 4223. The previous headquarters were located in QLD 4223 (from 2014-09-22 to 2016-01-08), QLD 4223 (from 2014-01-15 to 2014-09-22), and QLD 4223 (from 2004-10-25 to 2014-01-15). Bundow Pty Ltd was registered for the GST on 2000-07-01, up until 2022-09-30. Bundow Pty Ltd has been using the Bundow Pty Ltd trading name since 2001-11-23 (it needs to be noted that the Australian Business Register no longer collects or updates trading names). In total the company used 5 trading names. The company has also used 17 business names, namely Just Wholesale Car And Commercial from 2020-01-06 to 2021-07-01, Just Wholesale Car And Commercial from 2017-02-24 to 2019-05-16 and David Budini Wholesale from 2016-08-22 to 2021-03-19. The above data comes from the ABN database which was updated on 2022-10-01.
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Cancelled | 2022-09-30 | current |
Active | 2000-02-03 | 2022-09-30 |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bundow Pty Ltd | 2000-02-03 | current |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Just Wholesale Car And Commercial | 2020-01-06 | 2021-07-01 |
Just Wholesale Car And Commercial | 2017-02-24 | 2019-05-16 |
David Budini Wholesale | 2016-08-22 | 2021-03-19 |
I Service Vans | 2016-07-25 | 2021-07-11 |
I Service Vans | 2016-07-24 | current |
I Sell Vans | 2015-01-05 | 2018-05-22 |
David Budini Wholesale | 2009-08-21 | 2015-06-04 |
Currumbin Car Sales | 2008-11-25 | 2009-08-24 |
Aaa Service Centre | 2005-03-22 | 2008-07-22 |
Aaa Transmissions | 2005-03-02 | 2008-07-02 |
Dnc Wholesale | 2004-11-26 | 2010-03-29 |
Just Magna Automotive | 2003-02-27 | 2004-06-27 |
Magna Auto's | 2001-11-01 | 2009-04-05 |
Tojo's Japanese Motor Wreckers | 2000-02-03 | 2002-03-01 |
Magna Wreck | 2000-02-03 | 2011-06-01 |
Vanwreck | 2000-02-03 | 2003-04-03 |
Corolla Wreck | 2000-02-03 | 2000-09-20 |
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Bundow Pty Ltd | 2001-11-23 | current |
Bundow Pty Ltd | 2001-11-23 | current |
Tojo Japanese Motor Wreckers | 2000-07-05 | current |
Magna Wreck | 2000-07-05 | 2001-11-23 |
Nerang Auto Wreckers | 2000-02-03 | 2001-11-23 |
Location | From | To |
---|---|---|
QLD 4223 | 2016-01-08 | current |
QLD 4223 | 2014-09-22 | 2016-01-08 |
QLD 4223 | 2014-01-15 | 2014-09-22 |
QLD 4223 | 2004-10-25 | 2014-01-15 |
QLD 4211 | 2000-02-03 | 2004-10-25 |
Status | From | To |
---|---|---|
Registered | 2000-07-01 | 2022-09-30 |
Advertisements
Register Name | AFS Representative |
AFS Representative Number | 000333263 |
Appointment status | Ceased |
AFS authorised representative start date | 2008-12-23 |
AFS authorised representative end date | 2012-10-29 |
AFS Representative's principal business address |
Currumbin Australia |
Can appoint other Australian Financial Services representatives | No |
Australian Financial Services authorisations: | |
AFS authorised representative will be assigned licence authorisations by the licensee | Yes |
AFS representative business name | DAVID BUDINI WHOLESALE |
Contains public sector information licensed under the Creative Commons Attribution 3.0 Australia licence. Material on this website was obtained from publicly-accessible databases and is attributed to ©Commonwealth of Australia 2024 (http://data.gov.au, http://acnc.gov.au/ and http://abr.business.gov.au/), ©Intellectual Property Government Open Data 2024, ©ASIC - Company Register. While we try to make the information as precise and up-to-date as possible, we are aware the datasets are not always error-free. Aubiz.net will not take responsibility for any errors in the databases. The material provided should be treated as a starting point of more in-depth research, not as fact.